Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Domenico Cardinal Spinola

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580²BornGenova
19 Jan 162646.0Elevated to Cardinal
9 Feb 162646.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
30 Apr 162949.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
13 Nov 163050.8AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
15 Dec 163050.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
26 Apr 163252.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
1 Dec 163656.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
17 Aug 163757.6ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
11 Aug 164666.6DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Spinola:
Giovanni Domenico Cardinal Spinola (died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
  • a cardinal for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 226, and Page 67
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,675
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015