Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Francesco Moraglia

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1953 BornGenova
29 Jun 197724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
6 Dec 200754.5AppointedBishop of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato, Italy
3 Feb 200854.6Ordained BishopBishop of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato, Italy
1 Mar 200854.7InstalledBishop of La Spezia-Sarzana-Brugnato, Italy
31 Jan 201258.6AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
25 Mar 201258.8InstalledPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Moraglia:
Patriarch Francesco Moraglia (born ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2012
  • i: CB, 20 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015