Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Casoni

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1733BornSarzana, Italy
21 Feb 179460.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
4 May 179461.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Perge
24 May 179461.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1800²66.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
23 Feb 180167.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 Mar 180471.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
Jun 1806³73.2AppointedSecretary of State
2 Feb 1808³74.9RetiredSecretary of State
9 Oct 181178.5DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Casoni (VIAF: 26918570)
Filippo Cardinal Casoni (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
  • a cardinal for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 7
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 333
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Nov 2016