Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giorgio Cardinal Fieschi (Flisco)

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Administrator of Luni


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1433SelectedBishop of Mariana, France
10 May 1434ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, France
27 Feb 1435Ordained BishopBishop of Mariana, France
3 Oct 1436AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
18 Dec 1439Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 1440AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
1446²AppointedAdministrator of Luni, Italy
13 Feb 1447AppointedAdministrator of Noli, Italy
31 Jul 1448AppointedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
7 Aug 1448ResignedAdministrator of Noli, Italy
5 Mar 1449AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
28 Apr 1455AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
21 Dec 1459ResignedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
11 Oct 1461DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Fieschi (Flisco):
Cardinal Giorgio Fieschi (Flisco) (died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
  • a cardinal for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,721
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013