Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carl Anthony Fisher, S.S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Tlos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1945Born
2 Jun 197327.5Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Society of the Sacred Heart
23 Dec 198641.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
23 Dec 198641.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
23 Feb 198741.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
2 Sep 199347.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Carl Anthony Fisher
Bishop Carl Anthony Fisher S.S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlacePascagoula, MS

  • a priest for 20.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast