Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dennis Patrick O’Neil

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Macon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1940Born
30 Apr 196626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
16 Jan 200161.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA
16 Jan 200161.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Macon
27 Mar 200161.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macon
17 Oct 200363.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Dennis Patrick O’Neil
Bishop Dennis Patrick O’Neil (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Bernardino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFreemont, NE

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,951
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast