Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Azarcon Solis

Bishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1953 Born
28 Apr 197925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cabanatuan, Philippines
17 Jun 199238.6IncardinatedPriest of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
11 Dec 200350.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
11 Dec 200350.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Urci
10 Feb 200450.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urci
10 Jan 201763.2AppointedBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
7 Mar 201763.4InstalledBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA

MicroData Summary for Oscar Azarcon Solis
Bishop Oscar Azarcon Solis (born ) Bishop of Salt Lake City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Jose City, Diocese of Cabanatuan, Philippines, Philippines

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salt Lake City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,530
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jan 2017