Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Forsyth Christensen

Bishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1952 Born
25 May 198532.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
28 Jun 200754.5AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
14 Sep 200754.7Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
23 Sep 200754.7InstalledBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
4 Nov 201461.8AppointedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
17 Dec 201461.9InstalledBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Forsyth Christensen
Bishop Peter Forsyth Christensen (born ) Bishop of Boise City

EventPlace
Birth PlacePasadena, CA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Boise City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,509
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2014
  • i: CB, 4 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast