Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Gerard O’Connell

Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California

Titular Bishop of Cell Ausaille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1953 BornCork, Ireland
1979²25.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Los Angeles, California, USA
10 Jun 197925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
21 Jul 201561.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
21 Jul 201561.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cell Ausaille
8 Sep 201562.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cell Ausaille

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David Gerard O’Connell:
Bishop David Gerard O’Connell (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2015
  • mn: CB, 21 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Jul 2015
  • od/c0: CB, 29 Jul 2015
  • c23: CB, 11 Aug 2015
  • c4: CB, 12 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,572

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015