Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Thomas Steinbock

Deceased

Bishop of Fresno, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1937Born
1 May 196325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
29 May 198446.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orange in California, USA
29 May 198446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Midila
14 Jul 198446.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Midila
27 Jan 198749.5AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa (in California), USA
31 Mar 198749.7InstalledBishop of Santa Rosa (in California), USA
15 Oct 199154.2AppointedBishop of Fresno, California, USA
24 Nov 199154.3InstalledBishop of Fresno, California, USA
5 Dec 201073.3DiedBishop of Fresno, California, USA

MicroData Summary for John Thomas Steinbock
Bishop John Thomas Steinbock (born , died ) Bishop of Fresno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Angeles

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast