Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Duran Moreno

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tucson, Arizona, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1930Born
25 Apr 196130.4Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
20 Dec 197646.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
20 Dec 197646.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamagrista
19 Feb 197746.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamagrista
12 Jan 198251.1AppointedBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
11 Mar 198251.2InstalledBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
7 Mar 200372.2ResignedBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
17 Nov 200675.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Tucson, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Manuel Duran Moreno
Bishop Manuel Duran Moreno (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tucson

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlacentia

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast