Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Phillip Francis Straling

Bishop Emeritus of Reno, Nevada, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1933 Born
19 Mar 195925.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Diego, California, USA
14 Jul 197845.2AppointedBishop of San Bernardino, California, USA
6 Nov 197845.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Bernardino, California, USA
21 Mar 199561.9AppointedBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
21 Jun 200572.1ResignedBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA

MicroData Summary for Phillip Francis Straling
Bishop Phillip Francis Straling (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Reno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Bernardino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Reno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast