Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Edward Blaire

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Stockton, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1941Born
29 Apr 196725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
17 Feb 199048.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
17 Feb 199048.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamzella
31 May 199048.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamzella
18 Jan 199957.0AppointedBishop of Stockton, California, USA
16 Mar 199957.2InstalledBishop of Stockton, California, USA
23 Jan 201876.0RetiredBishop of Stockton, California, USA
18 Jun 201977.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Stockton, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Edward Blaire (VIAF: 14949508)
Bishop Stephen Edward Blaire (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Stockton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California
Ordained BishopSte. Vibiana, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California
Death PlaceModesto, Diocese of Stockton, California

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,971
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2018
  • d: CB, 18 Jun 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast