Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Salazar

Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Nesqually


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1949 Born
16 Jun 198434.5Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
7 Sep 200454.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
7 Sep 200454.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nesqually
4 Nov 200454.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nesqually

MicroData Summary for Alexander Salazar
Bishop Alexander Salazar (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José, Archdiocese of San José de Costa Rica
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Angels, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,709

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast