Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Martin Sartoris

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Oliva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1927 Born
30 May 195325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
8 Feb 199466.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
8 Feb 199466.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Oliva
19 Mar 199466.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oliva
31 Dec 200275.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Martin Sartoris
Bishop Joseph Martin Sartoris (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Angeles

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018