Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas John Curry

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Ceanannus Mór


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1943 Born
17 Jun 196724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
8 Feb 199451.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
8 Feb 199451.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceanannus Mór
19 Mar 199451.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceanannus Mór
3 Apr 201875.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas John Curry
Bishop Thomas John Curry (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrumgoon, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte. Vibiana, Cathedral, Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,256
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Apr 2018