Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward William Clark

Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA

Titular Bishop of Gardar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1946 Born
9 May 197225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
16 Jan 200154.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
16 Jan 200154.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gardar
26 Mar 200154.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gardar

MicroData Summary for Edward William Clark
Bishop Edward William Clark (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinneapolis, MN

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Los Angeles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,949

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast