Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Soto

Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1955 Born
12 Jun 198226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Orange in California, USA
23 Mar 200044.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orange in California, USA
23 Mar 200044.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Segia
31 May 200044.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segia
11 Oct 200751.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA
19 Nov 200751.8InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA
29 Nov 200852.9SucceededBishop of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Jaime Soto
Bishop Jaime Soto (born ) Bishop of Sacramento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInglewood

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sacramento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,776

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast