Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Edward Freyer

Auxiliary Bishop of Orange in California, USA

Titular Bishop of Strathernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1963 Born
10 Jun 198925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Orange in California, USA
23 Nov 201653.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orange in California, USA
23 Nov 201653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Strathernia
17 Jan 201753.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strathernia

MicroData Summary for Timothy Edward Freyer
Bishop Timothy Edward Freyer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Orange in California

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Angeles
Ordained BishopSaint Columban, Garden Grove

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orange in California.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2016
  • mn/c1: CB, 23 Nov 2016
  • ob: CB, 23 Nov 2016
  • c2+: CB, 4 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast