Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Patrick Driscoll

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Boise City, Idaho, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1939Born
1 May 196525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Los Angeles, California, USA
19 Dec 198950.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orange in California, USA
19 Dec 198950.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
6 Mar 199050.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita
18 Jan 199959.4AppointedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
17 Mar 199959.6InstalledBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
4 Nov 201475.2RetiredBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
24 Oct 201778.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Boise City, Idaho, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Patrick Driscoll
Bishop Michael Patrick Driscoll (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Boise City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLong Beach
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Cathedral, Orange, Diocese of Orange in California
Death PlaceBoise, Diocese of Boise City, Idaho

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,694
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2014
  • d: CB, 24 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast