Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aires de Ornelas de Vasconcelos

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1837Born
11 Nov 186023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Funchal, Portugal
6 Mar 187133.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Funchal, Portugal
6 Mar 187133.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
7 May 187133.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
19 Sep 187235.0SucceededBishop of Funchal, Portugal
17 Nov 187437.1AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
28 Nov 188043.1DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Aires de Ornelas de Vasconcelos
Archbishop Aires de Ornelas de Vasconcelos (born , died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFunchal, Diocese of Funchal, Portugal
Ordained BishopEnglish College, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 278, and Page 284
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 287
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017