Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emmanuel Felix Soares (de Santa Catarina), O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1727BornBraga
6 Mar 175124.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Discalced Carmelites
19 Mar 175124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
1 Jun 177851.2SelectedBishop of Cochin, India
20 Jul 177851.4ConfirmedBishop of Cochin, India
13 Sep 177851.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
9 Apr 178356.1SelectedArchbishop of Goa, India
18 Jul 178356.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Goa, India
10 Feb 181284.9DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Felix Soares (de Santa Catarina):
Archbishop Emmanuel Felix Soares (de Santa Catarina) O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Goa

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 227, and Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016