Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato da Veiga Coutinho

Deceased

Bishop of Belgaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1920BornMargão
26 Oct 194424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bangalore, India
2 Jul 196241.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Belgaum, India
2 Jul 196241.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sagalassus
3 Sep 196241.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sagalassus
15 Mar 196443.4SucceededBishop of Belgaum, India
8 Feb 196746.3DiedBishop of Belgaum, India

MicroData Summary for Fortunato da Veiga Coutinho:
Bishop Fortunato da Veiga Coutinho (born , died ) Bishop of Belgaum

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013