Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspar de Lećo Pereira

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1558AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
15 Apr 1560Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
1567¹ResignedArchbishop of Goa, India
19 Nov 1572AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
15 Aug 1576DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar de Lećo Pereira (VIAF: 89182092)
Archbishop Gaspar de Lećo Pereira (died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagos, Diocese of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a bishop for 16.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,731
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Oct 2017