Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Dioecesis Sancti Iacobi Capitis Viridis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 31 January 1533
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cape Verde
  • Square Kilometers: 1,803 (696 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 46, Av. Amilcar Cabral, Largo 5 de Outubro, Praia 7600, Cabo Verde
  • Telephone: 261.11.19
  • Fax: 261.21.26

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
31 January 1533ErectedDiocese of Funchal Diocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde (erected)
4 September 1940Territory LostDiocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde Mission "Sui Iuris" of Guinea Portoghese (erected)
9 December 2003Territory LostDiocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde Diocese of Mindelo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950168,109176,68795.1%718256,72415930ap1951
1970250,961256,96997.7%1234465,455362830ap1971
1980294,360300,55097.9%1230427,008363030ap1981
1990344,921355,89896.9%1235477,3384010230ap1991
1999432,424451,90995.7%1435498,8245511131ap2000
2000443,325475,85093.2%1335489,2356210831ap2001
2001408,813434,26394.1%1235478,6984912331ap2002
2002452,320487,57592.8%1335489,4234112331ap2003
2003410,079443,62592.4%1337508,2015312731ap2004
2004292,488318,31791.9%1220329,1402710519ap2005
2010311,922365,00085.5%1222349,174237621ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 7 Jul 2013