Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Filípe do Carmo Colaço

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1910Born
22 Sep 193424.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 195645.7AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
27 May 195645.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
21 Apr 197564.7ResignedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
1 Jan 199180.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for José Filípe do Carmo Colaço
Bishop José Filípe do Carmo Colaço (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMargão

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast