Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Cardinal da Costa Nuñes

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Goa e Damão, India

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1880Born
26 Jul 190323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Macau, China
16 Dec 192040.7AppointedBishop of Macau, China
20 Nov 192141.6Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
11 Dec 194060.7AppointedArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India
11 Dec 194060.7AppointedPatriarch of East Indies, India
16 Sep 195373.5ResignedArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India
16 Sep 195373.5ResignedPatriarch of East Indies, India
16 Dec 195373.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Odessus
16 Dec 195373.7AppointedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber
19 Mar 196282.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 196282.0ResignedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber
22 Mar 196282.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
29 Nov 197696.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Goa e Damão, India

MicroData Summary for José da Costa Nuñes (VIAF: 16120997)
José Cardinal da Costa Nuñes (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Goa e Damão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCandelária, Diocese of Angra, Portugal
Ordained PriestEpiscopal Palace, Chapel, Macau, Diocese of Macau, China
Ordained BishopChurch, Horta, Diocese of Macau, China
Death PlaceClinica Madonna di Fatima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Church, Candelária, Diocese of Angra, Portugal

  • a priest for 73.3 years
  • a bishop for 55.0 years
  • a cardinal for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 85
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Mar 1962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jul 2017