Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Mello, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

Note/Previous Titular See: (Lourenço de Santa Maria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1704³Born
3 Jun 173026.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
13 Jun 173026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
15 Sep 174238.6SelectedArchbishop of Goa, India
26 Nov 174238.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Goa, India
9 Jun 174339.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
17 Jan 175045.9ResignedArchbishop of Goa, India
29 Jan 175248.0SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
15 May 175248.3ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
8 Dec 175248.8InstalledBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
5 Dec 178379.8DiedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Mello
Archbishop Francisco de Mello O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Pedro de Avelano

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 227, and Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast