Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teotónio Emanuel Ribeiro Vieira de Castro

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa e Damão, India

Patriarch of East Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1859Born
8 Apr 188222.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189939.9AppointedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
15 Aug 189940.0Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
25 May 192969.8AppointedArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India
25 May 192969.8AppointedPatriarch of East Indies, India
16 May 194080.8DiedArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India

MicroData Summary for Teotónio Emanuel Ribeiro Vieira de Castro
Archbishop Teotónio Emanuel Ribeiro Vieira de Castro (born , died ) Archbishop of Goa e Damão

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto, Diocese of Porto, Portugal
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto, Diocese of Porto, Portugal

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,108
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 551
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017