Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Alexis D’Souza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Poona, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1889Born
20 Dec 191930.3Ordained PriestPriest of Goa e Damão, India
12 May 194959.7AppointedBishop of Poona, India
24 Aug 194960.0Ordained BishopBishop of Poona, India
12 Jun 196777.8RetiredBishop of Poona, India
12 Jun 196777.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
18 Jan 197181.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
26 Aug 198091.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Poona, India

MicroData Summary for Andrew Alexis D’Souza
Bishop Andrew Alexis D’Souza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Poona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiolim

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast