Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop António Brandão, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹BornAlcobaca
17 Dec 167454.9AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
24 Feb 167555.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
6 Jul 167858.5DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Brandão:
Archbishop António Brandão O. Cist. (died ) Archbishop of Goa

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015