Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostinho da Anunciação, Ord. D.N.J.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1690AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
29 Jun 1690Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
6 Jul 1713DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Agostinho da Anunciação:
Archbishop Agostinho da Anunciação Ord. D.N.J.C. (died ) Archbishop of Goa

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015