Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Marilla Ferreira da Silva, S.M.P. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Missionários da Boa Nova

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1888BornPardilhó
11 Mar 191122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionários da Boa Nova
8 Feb 193142.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goa e Damão, India
8 Feb 193142.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gurza
29 Jun 193142.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gurza
1940²51.4AppointedSuperior General of Missionários da Boa Nova
1949²60.4ResignedSuperior General of Missionários da Boa Nova
28 May 194960.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
22 Nov 197486.3DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Missionários da Boa Nova

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Marilla Ferreira da Silva:
Archbishop Manuel Marilla Ferreira da Silva S.M.P. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Missionários da Boa Nova

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: CB, 1 Aug 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013