Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Đakovo-Osijek

Archidioecesis Diacovensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Đuro Hranić, Archbishop
  • Marin Srakić, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 18 June 2008
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Croatia
  • Square Kilometers: 11,288 (4,359 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://djos.hr/
  • Mailing Address: Biskupski Ordinarijat, Strossmayerov trg 6, 31400 Djakovo, Hrvatska
  • Telephone: (031)802.200
  • Fax: 812.310

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium) (erected)
Diocese of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem
9 July 1773UnitedDiocese of Bosnia (Bosna)
Diocese of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)
Diocese of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem
Diocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem
18 November 1963Name ChangedDiocese of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem Diocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem
Archdiocese of Đakovo-Osijek
18 June 2008SplitDiocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem Archdiocese of Đakovo-Osijek (also Elevated and Name Change)
Diocese of Srijem

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem
1950315,000400,00078.8%128291572,00637513118ap1951
Diocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem
1970500,0001,000,00050.0%180412212,26254739147ap1971
1980500,0001,200,00041.7%199472462,03253549166ap1981
1990514,0001,383,00037.2%198462442,10653488173ap1991
1999500,0001,400,00035.7%209422511,99244375178ap2000
2000468,1341,394,72033.6%207442511,86546389178ap2001
2001441,3221,394,36431.7%211462571,71748387178ap2002
2002477,4281,444,29333.1%209482571,85750387178ap2003
2003468,8491,436,82532.6%212482601,80349373178ap2004
2004447,9101,426,81831.4%208482561,74950365180ap2005
2006460,3101,430,62032.2%220472671,724149381180ap2007
Archdiocese of Đakovo-Osijek

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014