Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stjepan Bäuerlein

Deceased

Bishop of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1905Born
7 Apr 192923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
27 May 195145.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
27 May 195145.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica
29 Jun 195145.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea Pontica
12 Oct 195954.1AppointedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
9 Aug 197368.0DiedBishop of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia

MicroData Summary
Stjepan Bäuerlein
Bishop Stjepan Bäuerlein
(born , died )
Bishop of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBabina Greda, Diocese of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Djakovo, Diocese of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem
Death PlaceDjakovo, Diocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 64
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,809
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 100, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025