Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Šimun Bratulić, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
1598AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
15 Jan 1601AppointedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
19 Aug 1601Ordained BishopBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
13 Sep 1604AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
1611¹DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Šimun Bratulić
Bishop Šimun Bratulić O.S.P.P.E. (died 1611) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a bishop for 9.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 301
  • ob: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,601, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast