Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Baptista KrapÓc

Deceased

Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1843BornKarlovac
1866¹22.5Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
8 Feb 190460.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
8 Feb 190460.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Belgrado e Semendria o Smederevo
17 Apr 190460.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belgrado e Semendria o Smederevo
7 Apr 191066.8SelectedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
24 May 191066.9ConfirmedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
15 Jul 191673.1DiedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ivan Baptista KrapÓc:
Bishop Ivan Baptista KrapÓc (born , died ) Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1904, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 83, and Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 May 2014