Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emeric Karol Raffay

Deceased

Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1753³Born
18 Dec 177623.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
21 Dec 177623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
12 Jan 181662.1SelectedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
22 Jul 181662.7ConfirmedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
25 Aug 181662.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
10 Jan 183076.1DiedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emeric Karol Raffay
Bishop Emeric Karol Raffay (born , died ) Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProzorje

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 41
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast