Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Maria Favini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹Born
14 May 170359.3AppointedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
20 May 170359.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
21 May 171167.3DiedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Maria Favini (VIAF: 251159474178027661279)
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Maria Favini O.F.M. Conv. (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaiani, Diocese of Crema, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Lucia alle Botteghe Oscure, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceWien, Diocese of Wien, Austria

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 358
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 48
  • ob/c2/bd/d: AT, 12 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Aug 2020

Quantcast