Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislav Szörényi

Deceased

Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1670³BornTrencsemic
22 Dec 169626.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Mar 169726.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 173463.3AppointedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
4 Apr 173463.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
13 Nov 175282.0DiedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ladislav Szörényi:
Bishop Ladislav Szörényi (born , died ) Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015