Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bože Radoš

Bishop-Elect of Varaždin, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1964 Born
29 Jun 199025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
1 Aug 201954.9AppointedBishop of Varaždin, Croatia
24 Nov 201955.2Ordained BishopBishop of Varaždin, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Bože Radoš
Father Bože Radoš (born ) Bishop-Elect of Varaždin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrvenice, Diocese of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina
Ordained BishopAssumption of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Varaždin, Diocese of Varaždin

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Varaždin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast