Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Patačić

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1699³Born
4 Apr 172222.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 172930.1SelectedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
12 Feb 173131.7ConfirmedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
28 Sep 173334.4AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
5 Dec 174546.5DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Patačić
Archbishop Gabriel Patačić (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZagreb

  • a priest for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173, and Page 382
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast