Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Vernić

Deceased

Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1673BornRunac
29 Sep 171643.6SelectedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
22 Nov 171744.7ConfirmedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
2 Jan 171844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
172955.8DiedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Franjo Vernić:
Bishop Franjo Vernić , Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 358
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014