Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Márton Pethe de Hetes

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹Born
1582²27.0AppointedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
26 Oct 158328.8AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
16 Jan 158934.0AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
15 Dec 160045.9AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
3 Oct 160550.7DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Márton Pethe de Hetes
Archbishop Márton Pethe de Hetes (born 1555, died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 325, and Page 326
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 172, and Page 301
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast