Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miklós Zelniczey Naprady

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
1593²AppointedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
17 Jun 1596AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
15 Dec 1600AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
19 Aug 1601Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
1604¹DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miklós Zelniczey Naprady
Bishop Miklós Zelniczey Naprady (died 1604) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 280, and Page 301
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast