Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Mandić

Deceased

Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1740³BornPožega
18 Dec 176222.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Aug 176323.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 180665.8SelectedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
26 Aug 180666.0ConfirmedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
28 Sep 180666.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
11 Jan 181574.4DiedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Mandić:
Bishop Anton Mandić (born , died ) Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013