Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikuláš Csáky (de Bačka)

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád, Hungary


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Apr 1499AppointedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
13 Nov 1500AppointedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
5 Jun 1501AppointedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
21 Jun 1503AppointedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
15 Nov 1504AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
1514¹DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikuláš Csáky (de Bačka)
Bishop Mikuláš Csáky (de Bačka) (died 1514) Bishop of Csanád

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 254, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 204
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 161
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1500, Number 38*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast