Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Juraj Strossmayer

Deceased

Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1815Born
Feb 1838³22.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 184934.7SelectedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
20 May 185035.2ConfirmedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
8 Sep 185035.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia
8 Apr 190590.1DiedBishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem, Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josip Juraj Strossmayer (VIAF: 46887113)
Bishop Josip Juraj Strossmayer (born , died ) Bishop of Bosna (Djakovo) et Srijem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEszek

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 54.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 153
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017