Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Đura Gašparović

Bishop of Srijem, Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1951 Born
29 Jun 197726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
5 Jul 199645.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia
5 Jul 199645.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mattiana
5 Oct 199645.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mattiana
18 Jun 200856.9AppointedBishop of Srijem, Serbia

MicroData Summary for Đura Gašparović
Bishop Đura Gašparović (born ) Bishop of Srijem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGolubinci
Ordained BishopSaint Pierre l`Apôtre, Cathedral, Djakovo, Diocese of Djakovo o Bosna i Srijem, Croatia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Srijem.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,853
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Jan 2019

Quantcast