Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Krstitelj Paxy

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1718³BornKarolini in Transilvania
15 Apr 174325.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Jun 174325.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 176244.2SelectedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
20 Dec 176244.6ConfirmedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
17 Apr 176345.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
12 Jun 177052.1SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
10 Sep 177052.4ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
20 Dec 177153.6DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ivan Krstitelj Paxy:
Bishop Ivan Krstitelj Paxy (born , died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 382, and Page 448
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015